Daubendiek et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greg Lashay and Jessica Daubendiek
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01034
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Greg Lashay, Jessica Daubendiek upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pistotnik, Bradley)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Greg Lashay, Jessica Daubendiek.(Pistotnik, Bradley)
February 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jessica Daubendiek, Greg Lashay. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5051396.), filed by Greg Lashay, Jessica Daubendiek.(Pistotnik, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daubendiek et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Lashay
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Daubendiek
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?