United States of America v. Claggett et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Devin Lane Carlisle, Steven Carl Claggett and Kansas, State of ex rel. Kansas Department of Revenue
Case Number: 6:2020cv01047
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Complete Service. This case shall be stayed until May 19, 2020. Defendant Devin Lane Carlisle's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until June 19, 2020. Additionally, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), Plaintiff United States of America shall have until July 17, 2020 to complete service of process on any party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/24/2020. Mailed to pro se party Devin Lane Carlisle at 4201 Grande Dr. Amarillo, TX 79108 and Steven Carl Claggett at 940 Apollo St. Liberal, KS 67901 by regular mail (addresses found in #7 ). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Sheern, Brian). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/24/2020 (sz).
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Kansas, State of ex rel. Kansas Department of Revenue.(Wharton, Randall)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Devin Lane Carlisle waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Sheern, Brian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Kansas, State of ex rel. Kansas Department of Revenue served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020 (Sheern, Brian)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, and this Certificate of Mailing (Sheern, Brian)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sheern, Brian)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit E - Mortgage)(Sheern, Brian)
February 18, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas, State of ex rel. Kansas Department of Revenue (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Claggett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Lane Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Carl Claggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of ex rel. Kansas Department of Revenue
Represented By: Randall J. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian D. Sheern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?