Eastman et al v. Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Rae Starkey, Joshua Eyre, Staysha Sherwood, Megan Hertel, Montae Phillips, Mikayla Starkey, Eric Reed, Morgyn Holcomb, Madysen Holcomb, Nichole Holcomb, Destiny Eastman and Eric King
Defendant: Patricia Hardrick, Ron Bowens and Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The
Case Number: 6:2020cv01052
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. The conference will be held in Courtroom 326 at 401 N. Market, Wichita, Kansas and the parties are required to appear in person unless restrictions due to COVID-19 are still in effect. In that event, the conference will be held by telephone and participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/3/20. (ala)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The identifying None as corporate parent (Penner, Sylvia)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Nichole Holcomb, Eric King by Patricia Hardrick, Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The, Ron Bowens.(Penner, Sylvia)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Morgyn Holcomb, Rae Starkey, Eric Reed, Joshua Eyre, Nichole Holcomb, Destiny Eastman, Mikayla Starkey, Eric King, Megan Hertel, Staysha Sherwood, Montae Phillips, Madysen Holcomb upon Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020 (Adams, Corey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2020: #1 **corrected main document**) (jk).
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Morgyn Holcomb, Rae Starkey, Eric Reed, Joshua Eyre, Nichole Holcomb, Destiny Eastman, Mikayla Starkey, Eric King, Megan Hertel, Staysha Sherwood, Montae Phillips, Madysen Holcomb upon Ron Bowens served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020 (Adams, Corey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Morgyn Holcomb, Rae Starkey, Eric Reed, Joshua Eyre, Nichole Holcomb, Destiny Eastman, Mikayla Starkey, Eric King, Megan Hertel, Staysha Sherwood, Montae Phillips, Madysen Holcomb upon Patricia Hardrick served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020 (Adams, Corey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Katy Elizabeth Tompkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tompkins, Katy)
February 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The, Ron Bowens, Patricia Hardrick (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Destiny Eastman, Joshua Eyre, Megan Hertel, Madysen Holcomb, Morgyn Holcomb, Nichole Holcomb, Eric King, M. K., R. K., Montae Phillips, Eric Reed, Staysha Sherwood, Mikayla Starkey, Rae Starkey. (Adams, Corey) Modified on 2/21/2020 to correct Plaintiff's names. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2020: #1 **redacted main document**) (jk).
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5067736.), filed by Staysha Sherwood, Nichole Holcomb, Destiny Eastman, Eric Reed, Rae Starkey, Morgyn Holcomb, Joshua Eyre, R. K., Mikayla Starkey, M. K., Eric King, Megan Hertel, Montae Phillips, Madysen Holcomb.(Adams, Corey) Modified on 2/21/2020 to correct Plaintiff's names. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2020: #1 **redacted main document**) (jk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman et al v. Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Starkey
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Eyre
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staysha Sherwood
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Hertel
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montae Phillips
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikayla Starkey
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Reed
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgyn Holcomb
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madysen Holcomb
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Holcomb
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Eastman
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric King
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Katy Elizabeth Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hardrick
Represented By: Sylvia B. Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Bowens
Represented By: Sylvia B. Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbe-Q-Pit LLC, The
Represented By: Sylvia B. Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?