United States of America v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Derek R. Bowers and Lindsay M. Davis
Case Number: 6:2020cv01054
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stay of Proceedings. For good cause shown, and consistent with measures appropriate under the declared COVID-19 National Emergency, the Court hereby stays this case until May 19, 2020. Any unexpired responsive deadlines for those Defendants on whom service of process has been made are extended equal to the number of days this case is stayed. If matters are such that an extension of these deadlines may be appropriate, Plaintiff shall timely file an additional motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/24/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sheern, Brian)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Lindsay M. Davis waiver sent on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Sheern, Brian)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Derek R. Bowers waiver sent on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Sheern, Brian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, and this Certificate of Mailing (Sheern, Brian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sheern, Brian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement)(Sheern, Brian)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian D. Sheern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?