Robinson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Andrea Robinson
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01058
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference.(ss)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Andrea Robinson of Discovery Requests to Defendant (Tucker-Pope, Melissa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Allstate's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Mulhern, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company of Allstate's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures Documents (Mulhern, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/20/2020. (amh)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Andrea Robinson of Plaintiff's INitial rule 26(a)(1) Documents and Report of Parties' Planning Conference (Tucker-Pope, Melissa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company of Allstate's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Mulhern, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/20/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/20/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/16/2020. (ss)
March 3, 2020 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number W4631021484. (jk)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Mulhern, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 *DISREGARD* CIVIL FILING FEE PAID ONLINE BY CREDIT CARD: re: #1 Notice of Removal, (paid $400 fee). (Mulhern, Matthew) Modified on 3/3/2020, see payment information entered today. (jk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Mulhern, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Mulhern, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County, case number 2020-CV-000137 Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400.), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Petition, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - State Answer)(Mulhern, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2020 due to formatting error.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew F. Mulhern
Represented By: Robert J. Luder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Robinson
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: Melissa A. Tucker-Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?