Triplett v. Bartz et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Triplett
Defendant: Corey J. Farr and Randy G. Bartz
Case Number: 6:2020cv01062
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Corey J. Farr of Defendant Corey J. Farr's Opening Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Martinek, Ron)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/13/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/1/20. (aw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Attorney by Corey J. Farr (Martinek, Ron)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Corey J. Farr.(Martinek, Ron)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Randy G. Bartz.(Verduzco, Sheila)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Thomas E. Triplett upon Corey J. Farr served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (Omlid, Christopher)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Thomas E. Triplett upon Randy G. Bartz served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020 (Rhodes, Arthur)
March 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randy G. Bartz, Corey J. Farr (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thomas E Triplett. (Omlid, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5076872.), filed by Thomas E Triplett.(Omlid, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triplett v. Bartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey J. Farr
Represented By: Ron D. Martinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy G. Bartz
Represented By: Sheila D. Verduzco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Triplett
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?