Drowatzky v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Drowatzky, Ashley Wilson, LaToya Tatum, Ama Moore, Deborah Benjamin, Ashley E. Ragan, Monique Alisa Henderson, Jalisa Brooks and Kristen Marks
Defendant: ADT, LLC and ADT LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01065
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS Count II for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant ADT LLC. (Ballew, Gregory) Modified on 4/28/2020 to re-title. (mam)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due on or before 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant ADT LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Ballew, Gregory)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Steven A. Siegel for ADT LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/2/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Steven A. Siegel to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5106591.) by Defendant ADT LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Siegel, #2 ECF Registration Form of Steven Siegel)(Ballew, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/15/2020 for Defendant ADT LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/30/2020. (jk)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Paul, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Austin W. Anderson,for Nicholas Drowatzky pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Clifton Alexander for Nicholas Drowatzky pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/24/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney William Clifton Alexander to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5097682.) by Plaintiff Nicholas Drowatzky (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(Paul, Richard)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Austin W. Anderson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5097677.) by Plaintiff Nicholas Drowatzky (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(Paul, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nicholas Drowatzky upon ADT LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020 (Laura C. Fellows) Modified on 3/18/2020 to fix name of filing attorney. (jk)
March 6, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADT LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Drowatzky - trial to be held in Wichita. (Paul, Richard)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Nicholas Drowatzky. (Paul, Richard)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5081434.), filed by Nicholas Drowatzky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim)(Paul, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drowatzky v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Drowatzky
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Wilson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToya Tatum
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ama Moore
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Benjamin
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley E. Ragan
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Alisa Henderson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalisa Brooks
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Marks
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Laura C. Fellows
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Gregory D. Ballew
Represented By: Steven A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?