Kone v. Tate et al
Plaintiff: Andreas Kone
Defendant: Nancy S Tate, Crete Carrier Corporation and Nancy S. Tate
Case Number: 6:2020cv01080
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crete Carrier Corporation identifying None as corporate parent (Skolaut, Paul)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate.(Skolaut, Paul)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate - trial to be held in Wichita. (Skolaut, Paul)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Leave for Defendant Nancy S. Tate to Answer Out of Time. The court grants defendants' motion as unopposed. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by May 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to file an Answer by Defendants Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Skolaut, Paul)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Philip Davidson on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate (Davidson, J.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Paul J. Skolaut on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate (Skolaut, Paul)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Andreas Kone upon Crete Carrier Corporation served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020 (Turner, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Andreas Kone upon Nancy S. Tate served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020 (Turner, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Graff for Andreas Kone pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Robert M. Graff to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5103254.) by Plaintiff Andreas Kone (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Turner, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crete Carrier Corporation, Nancy S. Tate (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Andreas Kone. (Turner, Patrick)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5098672.), filed by Andreas Kone.(Turner, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kone v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S. Tate
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Kone
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: Robert M. Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?