Sinclair v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Julie Sinclair and Robert Sinclair
Defendant: Y&K Trucking LLC and Yunieski Rodriguez
Case Number: 6:2020cv01116
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julie Sinclair, Robert Sinclair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Omlid, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/10/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/10/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/8/2020. (ss)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Yunieski Rodriguez, Y&K Trucking LLC.(Matteuzzi, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Julie Sinclair upon Yunieski Rodriguez served on 5/16/2020, answer due 6/8/2020 (Omlid, Christopher)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Julie Sinclair upon Y&K Trucking LLC served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 (Omlid, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yunieski Rodriguez, Y&K Trucking LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Julie Sinclair. (Omlid, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5130154.), filed by Julie Sinclair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Omlid, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinclair v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y&K Trucking LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Represented By: Andrew Alexander DeMasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunieski Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Represented By: Andrew Alexander DeMasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Sinclair
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Dustin L. DeVaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sinclair
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Dustin L. DeVaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?