Mai v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Thanh Mai
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company and CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company a foreign for-profit corporation doing business as AAA Insurance
Case Number: 6:2020cv01130
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant by Thanh Mai (Sucher, John)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 and Discovery Responses to Defendant by Thanh Mai. (Sucher, John)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/7/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/15/2020. (mn)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Gibson, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of Discovery Requests (Gibson, John)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John H. Gibson on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gibson, John)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Thanh Mai upon CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020 (Sucher, John)
May 20, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thanh Mai. (Sucher, John)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5145573.), filed by Thanh Mai.(Sucher, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mai v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thanh Mai
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company a foreign for-profit corporation doing business as AAA Insurance
Represented By: Justen P. Phelps
Represented By: John H. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?