Hirsh v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01135
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to the filing of the Motion to Dismiss, #19 , and the Notice of Consent to Dismissal, #21 , the Court GRANTS #19 and this case is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/7/2020. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh 410 W 53rd St S Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Consent to Dismissal of Case by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Shapiro, Tony)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 20 Notice of Cancelled Hearing, mailed to James Adam Hirsh, 410 W 5 3rd St S, Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (sz)
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss filed by the Plaintiff, the Status Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer is CANCELLED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh (Titled "Journal Entry of Dismissal") (sz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 ***Modified main document received by mail***) (sz).
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR A JURY TRIAL by James Adam Hirsh. (sz)
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Second Amended Complaint by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Shapiro, Tony) (mam)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #16 mailed to James Adam Hirsh at 410 W 53rd St S, Wichita, KS 67217 on 6/24/2020 by regular mail. (jk)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/24/2020. (ala)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. To participate, please call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749, using ACCESS CODE 9686294. Plaintiff's pending Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply Under Local Rule 6.1(b) and status of the case generally will be discussed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/24/2020. Mailed to James Adam Hirsh, 410 W 53rd St S, Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(rel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., filed by James Adam Hirsh.(sz)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE REPLY UNDER LOCAL RULE 6.l(b)") (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (sz)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., filed by James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "Amended Petition") (sz)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P..(Shapiro, Tony)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Sedgwick County District Court on 5/13/2020.) (mam)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Shapiro, Tony)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh - trial to be held in Wichita. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heo)
May 22, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh at 410 W. 53rd St. S., Wichita, KS 67217. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE of Amended Notice of Filing in the District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas of Notice of Removal by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #6 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. identifying None as corporate parent . (Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, LP. (Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodgment by Resurgent Capital Services, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Shapiro, Tony)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas, case number 20SC0177; trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5147820.), filed by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsh v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Represented By: Tony Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Tony Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?