United States Department of Labor v. Kansas Steaks, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Defendant: Kansas Steaks, L.L.C. and Kansas Steaks, L.L.C. doing business as Golden Corral
Case Number: 6:2020cv01139
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Department of Labor. Kansas Steaks, L.L.C. waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Hague, Dana)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elaine M. Smith for United States Department of Labor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/13/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Elaine M. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff United States Department of Labor (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Hague, Dana)
May 29, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff United States Department of Labor - trial to be held in Wichita. (Hague, Dana)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States Department of Labor. (Hague, Dana)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hague, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Labor v. Kansas Steaks, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Dana M. Hague
Represented By: Elaine M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Steaks, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Steaks, L.L.C. doing business as Golden Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?