Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC v. Finish Line, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Defendant: Finish Line, Inc., The
Case Number: 6:2020cv01145
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. The court has added the form Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound as Attachment A of the protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/31/20. (jc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents Bates-Stamped PLTF 001 to PLTF 174 by Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (Doleshal, Jacob)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Finish Line, Inc., The of 2nd Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Woods, Samantha)
July 22, 2020 Correction to Trial Setting (LOCATION ONLY): Jury Trial set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. (heo)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/28/2020. Mediation deadline 10/30/2020. Discovery deadline 1/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 3/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/21/2020. (ss) (Modified on 7/22/2020 to correct trial location in docket text. (heo))
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (Doleshal, Jacob)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/21/2020. (AT&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Finish Line, Inc., The of Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Woods, Samantha)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 order to show cause. The court is satisfied it has diversity subject matter jurisdiction. This matter shall proceed accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/17/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shore, Heather)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By July 17, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report, with affidavits attached, demonstrating the citizenship of each of the parties and showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/13/20. (jc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Shore, Heather)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Peters for Finish Line, Inc., The pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Daniel S. Peters re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #11 by Defendant Finish Line, Inc., The(Woods, Samantha)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Daniel S. Peters to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5176383.) by Defendant Finish Line, Inc., The (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Woods, Samantha)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Finish Line, Inc., The identifying Genesis Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Woods, Samantha)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Finish Line, Inc., The.(Woods, Samantha)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/10/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/10/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/3/2020. (ss)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Filing and Serving the Notice of Removal by Finish Line, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woods, Samantha)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned randomly to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further pretrial non-dispositive proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Reason for recusal - Conflict Firm/Attorney for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ck)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #4 Notice of Removal by Defendant Finish Line, Inc., The . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Woods, Samantha)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kansas District Court for Sedgwick County, case number 2020-CV-000735 Trial location of Wichita, filed by Finish Line, Inc., The. (Woods, Samantha)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant The Finish Line, Inc.. (Woods, Samantha)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant The Finish Line, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woods, Samantha)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kansas District CCourt for Sedgwick County, case number 2020-CV-000735 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5156999.), filed by The Finish Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Woods, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC v. Finish Line, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towne West Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Represented By: Jacob M. Doleshal
Represented By: Heather Field Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finish Line, Inc., The
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?