McRae v. Hope Properties Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. McRae
Defendant: Hope Properties Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01194
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hope Properties Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Johannsen, Derek)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 9/29/2020) by Defendant Hope Properties Inc. (Johannsen, Derek)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/08/2020 for Defendant Hope Properties Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/17/2020. (jk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 (DISREGARD) -- MOTION for Order by Defendant Hope Properties Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Johannsen, Derek) Modified on 8/17/2020, proposed orders are emailed, not filed. (mam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 (DISREGARD) -- MOTION for extension of time by Defendant Hope Properties Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Johannsen, Derek) Modified on 8/17/2020, clerk's extensions are not filed but emailed to the clerk's office. (mam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of Hope Properties Inc.. (Johannsen, Derek)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kenneth D. McRae upon Hope Properties Inc. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (jk)
July 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hope Properties Inc. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sz)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff is directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summons to the Clerk for service. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER also denies #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/24/2020. (df)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Kenneth D. McRae is a registered pro se participant who will receive ECF notifications only. (gw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kenneth D. McRae. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (mam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth D. McRae. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.(mam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kenneth D. McRae. (mam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Kenneth D. McRae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Hope Properties Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Properties Inc.
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?