Zions Bancorporation, N.A. v. Equity Bank
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Defendant: Equity Bank
Case Number: 6:2020cv01214
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. Equity Bank waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 28, 2020 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equity Bank (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason M. Medley for Zions Bancorporation, N.A. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/18/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Jason M Medley to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff, Zions Bancorporation, N.A. ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5229937.) by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zions Bancorporation, N.A. identifying None as corporate parent . (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 7, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equity Bank (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5220039.), filed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A - Affidavit and Check)(Pemberton, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. v. Equity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Represented By: Phillip W. Pemberton
Represented By: Jason M. Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?