Harp Properties, LLC v. CCTMO, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harp Properties, LLC
Defendant: CCTMO, LLC and T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01313
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Second Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Defendants shall have until 2/3/2021 to file a third-party complaint without seeking leave of Court. If Defendants seek to file a third-party complaint after 2/3/2021, Defendants shall file a motion. Plaintiff shall have until 2/10/2021 to file its answer to Defendants' Counterclaims. Plaintiff shall have until 2/12/2021 to file a motion to remand. The parties shall submit a Report of Parties' Planning conference and respective Rule 26 initial disclosures by 3/31/2021. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/6/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/28/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Defendants CCTMO, LLC, T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Shapiro, Tony)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 initial disclosures deadline 3/1/2021. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/15/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel will call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/7/20. (aw)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Defendants CCTMO, LLC, T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Shapiro, Tony)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/14/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/14/2021. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/1/20. (aw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 COUNTER-DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Harp Properties, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wilson, Roger) Modified on 11/23/2020 (sz).
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Harp Properties, LLC by T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC, CCTMO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted)(Shapiro, Tony)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/18/2020 to re-title. (mam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants CCTMO, LLC, T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Shapiro, Tony)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CCTMO, LLC and T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC identifying Crown Castle International Corp. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. as corporate parents. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/13/2020 to add filer T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (mam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants CCTMO, LLC and T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/13/2020 to add filer T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (mam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by CCTMO, LLC andT-Mobile USA Tower, LLC of Proof of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/13/2020 to add filer T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (mam).
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SERVICE by CCTMO, LLC and T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC of Proof of Service of Notice of Removal Upon Plaintiff. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/13/2020 to add filer T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (mam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County, Kansas, District Court; case number 2020-cv-001625-RP; trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5321080.), filed by CCTMO, LLC and T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (Shapiro, Tony) Modified on 11/13/2020 to add filer T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC. (mam)
November 13, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harp Properties, LLC v. CCTMO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harp Properties, LLC
Represented By: Roger K. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCTMO, LLC
Represented By: Tony Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Tower, LLC
Represented By: Tony Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?