Chadwell v. United States of America, The
Plaintiff: Kurt Chadwell
Defendant: United States of America, The
Case Number: 6:2020cv01372
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/15/2021 for Defendant United States of America, The to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/24/2021. Mailed to pro se party Kurt Chadwell by regular mail. (jal)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Luke P. Sinclair on behalf of United States of America, The. (Sinclair, Luke)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Eugene Beall on behalf of United States of America, The. (Beall, Thomas)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kurt Chadwell. (jk)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Kurt Chadwell. (jk)
December 31, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to two different addresses for the Attorney General) (issued to Plaintiff for service). (jk) Modified on 1/4/2021 to clarify parties summons issued to. (jk)
December 31, 2020 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $402, receipt number W4631023976. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadwell v. United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Luke P. Sinclair
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Chadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?