In the matter of the tax indebtedness of: Gary Dunn and Barbara Dunn
Petitioner: United States of America
Debtor In Possession: Gary Dunn and Barbara Dunn
Case Number: 6:2020mc00103
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (mam)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Return of Service by United States of America re #5 Order on Motion for Order (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Return Service by United States of America re #3 Order of Entry (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ENTRY ON PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY granting #4 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/4/2020. (sz)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED APPLICATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO ENTER PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY by United States of America. (Amendment to #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Metzger, Emily) Modified on 3/4/2020 to retitle. (mam)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR ENTRY on Premises to Effect Levy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/28/20. (aw)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Movant United States of America. (Metzger, Emily)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Application to Enter Premises filed by Emily B. Metzger on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of the tax indebtedness of: Gary Dunn and Barbara Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Emily B. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Gary Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Barbara Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?