Mecadaq Tarnos v. TECT Aerospace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mecadaq Tarnos
Defendant: TECT Aerospace, Inc., TECT Aerospace, LLC, TECT Hypervelocity Inc. and TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01005
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/3/21. (df)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer(s) for all Defendants due on or before March 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/27/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) Or Otherwise Plead by Defendants TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc., TECT Aerospace, Inc., TECT Aerospace, LLC, TECT Hypervelocity Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Jones, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/27/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(tvn)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/18/2021 for Defendants TECT Hypervelocity Inc., TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc., TECT Aerospace, Inc., TECT Aerospace, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/26/2021. (jk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Jones on behalf of TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc., TECT Aerospace, Inc., TECT Aerospace, LLC, TECT Hypervelocity Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Mecadaq Tarnos upon TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Seely, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Mecadaq Tarnos upon TECT Aerospace, LLC served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Seely, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Mecadaq Tarnos upon TECT Hypervelocity Inc. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Seely, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Mecadaq Tarnos upon TECT Aerospace, Inc. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Seely, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mecadaq Tarnos identifying Mecadaq Group as corporate parent . (Seely, David)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/11/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ala)
January 11, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc., TECT Aerospace, Inc., TECT Aerospace, LLC, TECT Hypervelocity Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Mecadaq Tarnos. (Seely, David)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5376932.), filed by Mecadaq Tarnos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Seely, David)
January 8, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mecadaq Tarnos v. TECT Aerospace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECT Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECT Aerospace, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECT Hypervelocity Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECT Aerospace Wellington, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mecadaq Tarnos
Represented By: David G. Seely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?