Bensimon Gonzales-Baer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2021cv01026
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #8 : Certified mail receipt from summons return upon Attorney General by Plaintiff Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer. (jk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 3/9/2021. (Green card not provided by the USMS) (jk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 2/19/2021. (jk)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (jk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/10/2021. (mig)
February 10, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer (Overton, Kathleen)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer. (Overton, Kathleen)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer.(Overton, Kathleen)
January 28, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bensimon Gonzales-Baer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukas Bensimon Gonzales-Baer
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?