Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc. v. Air Comm Corporation LLC
Plaintiff: Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Air Comm Corporation LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv01098
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc. upon Air Comm Corporation LLC served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021 (Edwards, Patrick)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc.. (Edwards, Patrick)
April 22, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Air Comm Corporation LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc. identifying AMETEK Aerospace & Power Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Edwards, Patrick)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc.. (Edwards, Patrick)
April 15, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5462498.), filed by Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Edwards, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc. v. Air Comm Corporation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Comm Corporation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ametek Advanced Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?