Lewis v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Carroll William Lewis, II
Defendant: Joseph Robinette Biden, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director of and United States Treasury
Case Number: 6:2021cv01105
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 "Motion to Correct Record of the Court II." Plaintiff objects to the CMECF record indicating his cause of action as falling under "42:1981 Civil Rights" when his complaint lists causes of action under other statutes (42 US Code Sec. 2000bb-1, 42 US Code Sec. 1985, 22 US Code Sec. 7104, 18 US Code Sec. 2314). Plaintiff is instructed that this CMECF coding is used solely for Court statistical/tracking purposes. It has no impact on Plaintiff's case or this litigation. The Clerk chose the "42:1981 Civil Rights" category because the statutes indicated by Plaintiff are not available as categories in the Court's docketing system. The code for 42:1981 Civil Rights was chosen merely because it is the code most closely related to Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/9/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Motion to Correct Record of the Court by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (mam)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #9 Motion for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (mam)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO CORRECT RECORD OF THE COURT II by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (mam)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/26/2021 for Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director of, United States Treasury, Joseph Robinette Biden to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/4/2021. Mailed to pro se party Carroll William Lewis, II by regular mail. (kas)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO CORRECT RECORD OF THE COURT by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (mam)
June 3, 2021 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Robinette Biden, Janet L. Yellen (UST), Christopher Wray (FBI), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (returned to pro se Plaintiff for service). (mam)
June 3, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION re #4 / #5 / #6 / #8 : Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II provided page 1 of each summons which has been added to these entries as attachments. (mam)
June 2, 2021 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Robinette Biden, Director of Federal Bureau of Investigation (Christopher Wray), United States Treasury (Janet L. Yellen), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (returned to pro se Plaintiff for service). (mam)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (mam)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 5/14/2021. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Page 1 provided by the plaintiff on 6/3/2021) (mam).
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Certified Mail on 5/12/2021. (jk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director of served by Certified Mail on 5/14/2021. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Page 1 provided by the plaintiff on 6/3/2021) (mam).
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Treasury served by Certified Mail on 5/14/2021. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Page 1 provided by the plaintiff on 6/3/2021) (mam).
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- Joseph Robinette Biden served by Certified Mail on 5/18/2021 per tracking on usps.com. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Page 1 provided by the plaintiff on 6/3/2021) (mam).
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Carroll Williams Lewis, II is a registered pro se participant with ECF Notifications only. (gw)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Carroll William Lewis, II. (jk)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Carroll William Lewis, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (jk)
April 21, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Robinette Biden, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director of, United States Treasury, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (returned to pro se Plaintiff for service). (jk)
April 21, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $402, receipt number W4631024905. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Robinette Biden
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director of
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Treasury
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll William Lewis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?