Malick v. Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff: James D. Malick
Defendant: Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 6:2021cv01121
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office (Joseph, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Adriana M. Jisa to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5528040.) by Defendant Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Joseph, Christopher) Modified on 7/2/2021 to fix exhibit text (kas).
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Joseph on behalf of Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office (Joseph, Christopher)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by James D. Malick upon Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (jk)
June 3, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office (Returned to plaintiff for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) Mailed copy of NEF to pro se Plaintiff James D. Malick at 6830 N. Ingalls Rd., Ingalls, KS 67853. (jk)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is responsible for notifying Defendants of this lawsuit. Plaintiff's deadline for service of the Summons and Complaint upon Defendants under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is August 2, 2021. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/11/21. Mailed to pro se party James D. Malick,6830 N. Ingalls Rd., Ingalls, KS 67853, by regular mail. (adc)
May 7, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $402, receipt number W4631025039. (jk)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James D. Malick. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James D. Malick. (jk)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by James D. Malick. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malick v. Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Malick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?