Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC v. Schimming
Plaintiff: Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC
Defendant: Damon M Schimming
Case Number: 6:2021cv01161
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response from Plaintiff due by 9/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/4/21. Mailed to Plaintiff by certified mail (Tracking #7019 0700 0000 5927 3400). (df) Modified on 8/4/2021 to add tracking # (sz).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Answer of Damon M Schimming due on or before 8/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/26/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
July 23, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Damon M Schimming (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Walter, Roger)
July 14, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/21 cancelled pending entry of local counsel for Plaintiff. Thereafter, case will be set for a status conference rather than a scheduling conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/23/2021 for Defendant Damon M Schimming to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/30/2021. (jk)
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Roger N. Walter on behalf of Damon M Schimming. (Walter, Roger)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/10/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/30/21. (cc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 Letter to counsel of record regarding pro hac vice requirements. (sz)
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03104. Electronic file and docket sheet received. (sz)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting in part #4 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to close this case after transferring it to the District of Kansas. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/21/2021) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Conference filed by Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC. (Riemer, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY filed by Damon M Schimming re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 Appendix in Support filed by Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC re #12 Response/Objection (Riemer, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Riemer, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for three-week docket beginning 2/28/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. Motions due by 10/15/2021. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 4/16/2021. Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 2/7/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2022 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/12/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC. (Riemer, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/16/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/5/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riemer, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/10/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/20/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Damon M Schimming re #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Damon M Schimming re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Damon M Schimming (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DAMON M. SCHIMMING. (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by DAMON M. SCHIMMING. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11255968) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) A-1, #5 Exhibit(s) A-2, #6 Exhibit(s) A-3, #7 Exhibit(s) A-4, #8 Exhibit(s) B) (Wohlford, Lucas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC v. Schimming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visionpoint Advisory Group LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon M Schimming
Represented By: Lucas C. Wohlford
Represented By: Roger N. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?