First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Plaintiff: First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv01173
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 9/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/4/21. (ala)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Western Insurance Company.(Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anna D. Kamins on behalf of First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The. (O'Neal, Michelle) Modified on 7/16/2021 to correct attorney name. (kao)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna D. Kamins for The First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Continental Western Insurance Company shall answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before July 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/14/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Anna D. Kamins to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5535318.) by Plaintiff First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(O'Neal, Michelle)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Western Insurance Company identifying W. R. Berkley Corporation as corporate parent . (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company. (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McPherson County District Court, case number 2021-CV-000038 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5532598.), filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Christopher Crawford, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 9, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Christian Church of McPherson, Kansas, The
Represented By: Michelle Boehm O'Neal
Represented By: Anna D. Kamins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Represented By: Jean-Paul Assouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?