United States of America v. $165,620.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $165,620.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Empyreal Enterprises, LLC a Pennsylvania limited liability company doing business as Empyreal Logistics
Case Number: 6:2021cv01215
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephone KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/7/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/12/21. (cc)
October 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #4 / #5 / #6 : These documents were filed by Claimant Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (mam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 VERIFIED CLAIM by Claimant Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Lemon, Thomas) Modified on 10/12/2021 to correct the filer. (mam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Claimant Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Lemon, Thomas) Modified on 10/12/2021 to correct the filer. (mam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas G. Lemon on behalf of Claimant Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Lemon, Thomas) Modified on 10/12/2021 to correct the filer. (mam)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest In Rem and Order for Notice. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 9/10/2021. (sz)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wood, Colin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America.(Wood, Colin)
September 3, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $165,620.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Colin D. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $165,620.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Empyreal Enterprises, LLC a Pennsylvania limited liability company doing business as Empyreal Logistics
Represented By: Thomas G. Lemon
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?