Culbertson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Jeri A. Culbertson
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2021cv01233
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record re #9 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 10/8/2021. (jk)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 10/8/2021. (jk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (jk)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 29, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Jeri A. Culbertson (Young, Kelsey)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeri A. Culbertson - trial to be held in Wichita. (Young, Kelsey)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jeri A. Culbertson. (Young, Kelsey)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Jeri A. Culbertson.(Young, Kelsey)
September 27, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri A. Culbertson
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?