Kirby v. Broken Skull Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norman Kirby
Defendant: Broken Skull Trucking, Inc., Jason J. Spotanski, Blase Trucking, LLC, Blase Brokerage, LLC and Eric A. Blase
Case Number: 6:2021cv01238
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Request for Admission to Defendant Blase Trucking LLC by Norman Kirby. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tanya J. Hansen for Blase Brokerage, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/19/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
November 18, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Blase Brokerage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woods, Samantha)
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Blase Brokerage, LLC (Woods, Samantha)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Tanya J. Hansen to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5639901.) by Defendant Blase Brokerage, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing)(Woods, Samantha)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Samantha M. H. Woods on behalf of Blase Brokerage, LLC (Woods, Samantha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Norman Kirby upon Blase Brokerage, LLC served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/10/2021 (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Broken Skull Trucking, Inc., Jason J. Spotanski.(Skolaut, Paul)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Norman Kirby upon Broken Skull Trucking, Inc. served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/15/2021 (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Norman Kirby upon Jason J. Spotanski served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/15/2021 (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Norman Kirby of Withdrawal of Waiver of Service as to Blase Brokerage LLC (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/15/2021 for Defendants Jason J. Spotanski, Broken Skull Trucking, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/19/2021. (jk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Philip Davidson on behalf of Broken Skull Trucking, Inc., Jason J. Spotanski. (Davidson, J.)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broken Skull Trucking, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Skolaut, Paul)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Paul J. Skolaut on behalf of Broken Skull Trucking, Inc., Jason J. Spotanski. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 19, 2021 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blase Brokerage, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Norman Kirby. Blase Brokerage, LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Norman Kirby. Blase Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Norman Kirby. Eric A. Blase waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
October 4, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric A. Blase, Blase Brokerage, LLC, Blase Trucking, LLC, Broken Skull Trucking, Inc., Jason J. Spotanski (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Norman Kirby. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5601857.), filed by Norman Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Pistotnik, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Broken Skull Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Kirby
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Skull Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Spotanski
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blase Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blase Brokerage, LLC
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Blase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?