Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC doing business as Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, Charles Norris Winkler and Benjamin L. Daugherty
Case Number: 6:2021cv01293
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per #9 Amended Memorandum of Dismissal. (mam)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF DISMISSAL by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Bozarth, Raymond)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATED 01/26/2022 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Bozarth, Raymond)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Upon notification by counsel that this case has been resolved, all answer and service deadlines are suspended. Plaintiff's counsel shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents to the Court no later than 2/18/22. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/21/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Charles Norris Winkler. (Bozarth, Raymond)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 SERVED SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022 (Bozarth, Raymond)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 SERVED SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon Benjamin L. Daugherty served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022 (Bozarth, Raymond)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Bozarth, Raymond)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Bozarth, Raymond)
December 16, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 16, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC, Benjamin L. Daugherty, Charles Norris Winkler (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5664260.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Bozarth, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballers Sports Bar & Grill, LLC doing business as Ballers Sports Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Norris Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin L. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?