Sheridan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sheridan
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv01129
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Amendment to #13 Notice of Comparative Fault. (Morton, Kenneth)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Mediation Notice to be filed on or before 11/18/2022. Mediation deadline 12/16/2022. Discovery deadline 5/5/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. (https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605490757?pwd=am9SNHdoMXpKKzk3L3k2WVlydk9ydz09 // Meeting ID: 160 549 0757 // Passcode: 623533) Dispositive motion deadline 6/2/2023. Jury Trial to take place in Wichita. Date and courtroom location to be subsequently set by the Court. Estimated trial time: 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/21/22. (ala)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kimberly Sheridan of Discovery Requests (Lykins, Brendan)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Request for Interrogatories to Plaintiff, First Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Statement of Monetary Damages Sought by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Comparative Fault by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Morton, Kenneth)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/19/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Removal of Cause to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Morton, Kenneth)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Amended Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/2/22. (ala)
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth J. Morton on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2022-CV-000758-TC, trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5791782.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Morton, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheridan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sheridan
Represented By: Brendan P. Lykins
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth J. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?