Nambo v. Wichita, City of
Plaintiff: Brian A. Nambo
Defendant: Wichita, City of
Case Number: 6:2022cv01153
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 JUDGMENT ENTERED re: Order (Doc. #13 ) dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/29/2022. Mailed to pro se party Brian A. Nambo by regular mail. (jal)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ENTERED: Magistrate Judge Birzer's R&R (Doc. #6 ) is ADOPTED as the order of this Court. Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. This case is closed. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/29/2022. Mailed to pro se party Brian A. Nambo by regular mail. (jal)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re 11 Order, addressed to Brian A. Nambo. (kas)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court was contacted by a relative of Plaintiff who relayed Plaintiff's request that any activity in the case be postponed due to Plaintiff's health concerns. The only upcoming deadline is the deadline for Plaintiff to file objections to the Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge #6 . Based on the certified mail receipt, that deadline is currently August 8. Given Plaintiff's circumstances, the Court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file objections to the Report and Recommendation #6 to August 22, 2022. But the Court declines to stay this case indefinitely. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 7/29/2022.Mailed to pro se party Brian Nambo by certified mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
July 29, 2022 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 11 Order mailed to Brian Nambo on 7/29/2022 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number 70200640000115800415. (sz)
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT as to Brian A. Nambo. (mam)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #6 Report and Recommendations, addressed to Brian A. Nambo. (kas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned bearing tracking # 7019 0700 0000 5927 3424 addressed to Brian A. Nambo 3321 W. Zoo Blvd. Apt. 113 Wichita, KS 67203. (jk)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Brian A. Nambo. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sz)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Re #1 Complaint filed by Brian A. Nambo. See order for details. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2022. Document Sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/20/22. Mailed to pro se party Brian A. Nambo by certified mail. (Certified Mail: 7010 2780 0003 1928 0833) (msb)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/20/22. Mailed to pro se party Brian A. Nambo, 3321 W. Zoo Blvd., Apt. 113, Wichita, KS 67203 by regular mail.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (spa)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Brian A. Nambo. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (jk)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian A. Nambo. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brian A. Nambo. (jk)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Brian A. Nambo. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nambo v. Wichita, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Nambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?