Cameron v. Wichita, City of et al
Plaintiff: James I. Cameron, Jr.
Defendant: Wichita, City of, Sgt. (fnu) Boal and Off. (fnu) Tran
Case Number: 6:2022cv01168
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff James I. Cameron, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. On September 13, 2022, the Court sent a letter regarding deficiencies in Plaintiff James Cameron's filings. The letter was sent by U.S. Mail to Mr. Cameron at 805 S. San Pablo, Wichita, KS 67207 and is maintained in the chambers of the undersigned. Mr. Cameron must file an affidavit of financial status on or before September 28, 2022. The Court will postpone consideration of Plaintiff's motions to proceed without prepayment of fees until the amendment is filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/13/2022. Mailed to pro se party James Cameron by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
August 1, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - 1) Designation of place of trial is missing. 2) Civil cover sheet is missing. 3) Financial Affidavit for Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to James I. Cameron, Jr. by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James I. Cameron, Jr. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (jsh)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Wichita, filed by James I. Cameron, Jr. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Wichita, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James I. Cameron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. (fnu) Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off. (fnu) Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?