Shambaugh & Son, L.P. v. XL Insurance America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shambaugh & Son, L.P.
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv01185
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Shambaugh & Son, L.P. (Harper, Christopher)
August 31, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per #5 Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice.(mam)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/18/2022. (kas)
August 18, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to XL Insurance America, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shambaugh & Son, L.P. identifying EMCOR Group, Inc as corporate parent. (Harper, Christopher)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Shambaugh & Son, L.P. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Harper, Christopher)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5847263.), filed by Shambaugh & Son, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Harper, Christopher)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shambaugh & Son, L.P. v. XL Insurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shambaugh & Son, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?