Ford v. Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brandi Ford
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's General Stores, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Casey's Convenience Store doing business as Casey's Carry Out Pizza doing business as Casey's General Store 1905 doing business as Casey's and Casey's Retail Company a foreign corporation doing business as Casey's Convenience Store doing business as Casey's Carry Out Pizza doing business as Casey's General Store 1905 doing business as Casey's
Case Number: 6:2022cv01229
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. All other deadlines remain in effect. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
November 29, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Brandi Ford (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Barr, William)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/15/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/27/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 12/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/28/2022. (ht)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Casey's Retail Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Johnson, Schalie) Modified on 11/14/2022 to remove Casey's General Stores, Inc. as a filer. (mam)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's Retail Company identifying None as corporate parent. (Johnson, Schalie)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Schalie A. Johnson on behalf of Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) Modified on 11/14/2022 to remove Casey's General Stores, Inc. as a filer. (mam)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) Modified on 11/14/2022 to remove Casey's General Stores, Inc., as a filer. (mam)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Brandi Ford upon Casey's General Stores, Inc. served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022; Casey's Retail Company served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certified Green Card)(Barr, William)
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Casey's Retail Company, filed by Brandi Ford. (Barr, William) Modified on 10/19/2022 to change the defendant. (mam)
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Casey's General Stores, Inc., filed by Brandi Ford.(Barr, William)
October 11, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
October 11, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casey's General Stores, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
October 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Brandi Ford. (Barr, William)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5886608.), filed by Brandi Ford. (Barr, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Ford
Represented By: William LeFevre Barr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Casey's Convenience Store doing business as Casey's Carry Out Pizza doing business as Casey's General Store 1905 doing business as Casey's
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Retail Company a foreign corporation doing business as Casey's Convenience Store doing business as Casey's Carry Out Pizza doing business as Casey's General Store 1905 doing business as Casey's
Represented By: Schalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?