Berg et al v. Standguard Aquatics Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Berg and Tamara Simmons
Defendant: Standguard Aquatics Inc., Whitewater West Industries, Inc., McCown Gordon Construction, L.L.C. and DNS Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv01232
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Defendant Standguard Aquatics Inc. to file Answer by Defendant Standguard Aquatics Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Kalcik, Nanette)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Tamara Simmons, Lisa Berg upon Whitewater West Industries, Inc. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Sucher, John)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 (DISREGARD, duplicate of #8 ) -- SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Tamara Simmons, Lisa Berg upon McCown Gordon Construction, L.L.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Sucher, John) Modified on 12/1/2022, see #8 . (mam)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Tamara Simmons, Lisa Berg upon McCown Gordon Construction, L.L.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Sucher, John) Defendant modified on 12/1/2022. (mam)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tamara Simmons, Lisa Berg.(Sucher, John)
November 21, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DNS Consulting, LLC, McCown Gordon Construction, L.L.C., Whitewater West Industries, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/21/2022 for Defendant Standguard Aquatics Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/4/2022. (jsh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Toni Alyson Martin on behalf of Standguard Aquatics Inc. (Martin, Toni)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nanette Turner Kalcik on behalf of Standguard Aquatics Inc. (Kalcik, Nanette)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Tamara Simmons, Lisa Berg upon Standguard Aquatics Inc. served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022 (Sucher, John)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Lisa Berg, Tamara Simmons. (Sucher, John) Modified on 10/13/2022 to correct filer names. (jk)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5889376.), filed by Lisa Berg, Tamara Simmons.(Sucher, John) Modified on 10/13/2022 to correct filer names. (jk)
October 13, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Standguard Aquatics Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
October 13, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg et al v. Standguard Aquatics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Berg
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Simmons
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standguard Aquatics Inc.
Represented By: Nanette Turner Kalcik
Represented By: Toni Alyson Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitewater West Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCown Gordon Construction, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNS Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?