Davani v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sina Davani
Defendant: Travelers Personal Insurance Company and Geico Insurance Agency LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv01244
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/20/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
December 9, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
December 8, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Geico Insurance Agency LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Severson, Brooks)
December 7, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of COS Rule 26 Disclosures by Sina Davani. (McMaster, Kevin)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 03:00 PM by Telephone KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/9/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 12/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/10/22. (cc)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Insurance Agency LLC.(Vix, Lyndon)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brooks G. Severson on behalf of Geico Insurance Agency LLC. (Severson, Brooks)
October 31, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records and Filings per LR 81.2)(Harper, Christopher)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant Geico Insurance Agency LLC served 10/11/2022 by certified mail. (McMaster, Kevin) Modified on 10/28/2022 to include the service date. (mam)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant Travelers Personal Insurance Company served 10/10/2022 by certified mail. (McMaster, Kevin) Modified on 10/28/2022 to include the service date. (mam)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/25/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geico Insurance Agency LLC identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as corporate parent. (Vix, Lyndon)
October 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Geico Insurance Agency LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Vix, Lyndon)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lyndon W. Vix on behalf of Geico Insurance Agency LLC. (Vix, Lyndon)
October 25, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Travelers Personal Insurance Company of State and Federal Court Notices of Removal and Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit File-Stamped Copy of Notice of Removal - State Court, #2 Exhibit Email Service to Plaintiff of Removal Papers in State and Federal Court)(Harper, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Personal Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as corporate parent. (Harper, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Travelers Personal Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Harper, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas, case number 2022-CV-001894-CO, trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5898217.), filed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Harper, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davani v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sina Davani
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Lyndon W. Vix
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?