Duckworth v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dana C. Duckworth
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv01246
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
2 Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Dana C. Duckworth of Discovery Responses (King, Timothy)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/15/22. (ala)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER and Defenses to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Husain, Omar)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Opening Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Husain, Omar)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/27/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(drk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark B. Schaffer on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Schaffer, Mark)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE OF #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent. (Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2022-CV-001790-CO. trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5899910.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Husain, Omar)
October 26, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckworth v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana C. Duckworth
Represented By: Timothy J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark B. Schaffer
Represented By: Omar Husain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?