TSI Technologies LLC v. CFS Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TSI Technologies LLC
Defendant: CFS Brands, LLC and Dinex
Case Number: 6:2023cv01011
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/23/2023. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
March 23, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (Basgall, Frank)
March 16, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE by TSI Technologies LLC of Plaintiff's First Combined Discovery to Defendants. (Rathbun, Randall)
March 16, 2023 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff TSI Technologies LLC(Rathbun, Randall) Modified on 3/16/2023 to remove referral information (sz).
March 16, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
March 13, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE by TSI Technologies LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Rathbun, Randall)
March 8, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex (Basgall, Frank)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/7/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER sustaining #19 Motion for Order to Overrule Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/7/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
March 6, 2023 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Overrule Motion to Dismiss as Moot by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (Basgall, Frank)
March 6, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Overrule Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
March 2, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff TSI Technologies LLC re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rathbun, Randall)
February 23, 2023 Filing 17 REVISED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TSI Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rathbun, Randall)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TSI Technologies LLC.(Rathbun, Randall)
February 21, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 3/2/2023(ca)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff's response deadline is extended to 3/2/2023 by 5:00 PM. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff TSI Technologies LLC. (Rathbun, Randall)
February 16, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2023 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 3/2/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/7/2023. (byk)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document(s). The clerk is directed to place under seal the ECF Registration documents attached as Exhibits to [8-2] and [9-2] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal or Redact Document #8 -2 and #9 -2 ECF Registration Forms by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Basgall, Frank) Modified on 2/6/2023 to re-link. (mam)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marriam Lin and Adam L. Brookman for CFS Brands, LLC and Dinex pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/3/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Marriam Lin to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5976916.) by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Basgall, Frank) Modified on 2/6/2023 to seal attachment #2 per 12 Order (kas).
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Adam L. Brookman to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5976914.) by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Basgall, Frank) Modified on 2/6/2023 to seal attachment #2 per 12 Order (kas).
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Adam L. Brookman)(Basgall, Frank)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court FS Notice of Removal)(Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex identifying None as corporate parent. (Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex - trial to be held in Wichita. (Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants CFS Brands, LLC, Dinex. (Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2022-CV-002329-CO, trial location of Wichita, filed by Dinex, CFS Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Complaint (State Court), #2 Ex. B - Declaration of Terry Malone)(Basgall, Frank)
January 26, 2023 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 200000395. (jsh)
January 26, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSI Technologies LLC v. CFS Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSI Technologies LLC
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFS Brands, LLC
Represented By: Frank W. Basgall
Represented By: Adam L. Brookman
Represented By: Marriam Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinex
Represented By: Frank W. Basgall
Represented By: Adam L. Brookman
Represented By: Marriam Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?