Lotfi v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Nafiseh Lotfi
Defendant: United States Department of State, U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada, Antony Blinken and Ana Escrogima
Case Number: 6:2023cv01016
Filed: February 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/12/2023 for Defendants Antony Blinken, Ana Escrogima, U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada, United States Department of State to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/20/2023. (jsh)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Steven W. Brookreson, II on behalf of Antony Blinken, Ana Escrogima, U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada, United States Department of State (Brookreson, Steven)
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 2/27/2023 Antony Blinken served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023; Ana Escrogima served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023; U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023; United States Department of State served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Receipts)(Hacking, James)
February 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5979802.), filed by Nafiesh Lotfi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation of Place of Trial)(Hacking, James)
February 7, 2023 Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Ana Escrogima, U.S. Consulate in Montreal Canada, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (jk)
February 7, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotfi v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafiseh Lotfi
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Escrogima
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?