Sauvage v. Eskildsen
Plaintiff: Verl A. Sauvage
Defendant: Walter Eskildsen
Case Number: 6:2023cv01118
Filed: June 7, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Initial Disclosure Deadline. For good cause shown, the Court grants the motion and resets the scheduling conference for September 26, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., by phone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. The parties shall hold their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference on or before September 6, 2023. The Court extends the deadline to serve Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures up to and including September 13, 2023. On or before September 13, 2023, the parties shall email copies of their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and the proposed scheduling order to ksd_schwartz_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov following the process outlined in the Initial Order. Given these and the other extensions in this case, the Court cautions that further extensions of these deadlines are unlikely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 7/21/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
July 21, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Deadlines and Scheduling Conference by Defendant Walter Eskildsen (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (White, Brian)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court grants the joint motion and directs Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before August 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 7/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
July 14, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Walter Eskildsen (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (White, Brian)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for August 15, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/25/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/4/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 07/06/2023. (drk)
July 5, 2023 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/19/2023 for Defendant Walter Eskildsen to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/5/2023. (jsh)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Bergkamp on behalf of Walter Eskildsen. (Bergkamp, Rebecca)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. White on behalf of Walter Eskildsen. (White, Brian)
June 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Verl A. Sauvage of Complaint on Health Care Stabiliation Fund (Hayes, J.)
June 19, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verl A. Sauvage upon Walter Eskildsen served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023 (Hayes, J.)
June 7, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Verl Sauvage. (Hayes, J.)
June 7, 2023 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Verl Sauvage - trial to be held in Wichita. (Hayes, J.)
June 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6079143.), filed by Verl Sauvage.(Hayes, J.)
June 7, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nao)
June 7, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walter Eskildsen. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauvage v. Eskildsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verl A. Sauvage
Represented By: Kaylea Knappenberger
Represented By: J. Darin Hayes
Represented By: Kaylea D. Knappenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Eskildsen
Represented By: Brian L. White
Represented By: Rebecca Bergkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?