Rebein et al v. BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp et al
Plaintiff: David J. Rebein, Daniel B. Giroux, Judy Krueger and Michael T. Jilka
Defendant: BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company, Chevron Natural Gas, ETC Marketing, Ltd. and Macquarie Energy LLC
Case Number: 6:2023cv01245
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
2 Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference as to Cases 6:23-cv-01192-DDC-ADM, 6:23-cv-01195-DDC-ADM, 6:23-cv-01245-DDC-ADM, 6:23-cv-01249-DDC-ADM, and 5:23-cv-04116-DDC-ADM is scheduled for 1/25/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference - Zoom before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Zoom invitation will be provided to counsel of record by email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER. The court provisionally concludes plaintiffs have shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This provisional conclusion doesn't preclude future challenges to subject matter jurisdiction since the court owes a continuing duty to assess whether plaintiffs properly have invoked the court's jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 1/5/2024. (mam)
January 4, 2024 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT/RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause re Consolidation by Defendant Chevron Natural Gas. (Morris, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2024 Filing 45 STATEMENT/RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause re Consolidation by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Bengtson, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 44 STATEMENT/RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause re Consolidation by Defendants BP Energy Company, BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp. (Pfaff, Alan)
January 4, 2024 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause on Consolidation by Plaintiffs Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein. (Fowler, Jay)
December 22, 2023 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Macquarie Energy LLC. (McAllister, Stephen)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Flug Davidoff for Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp and BP Energy Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/22/2023. (jsh)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Devlin for Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp and BP Energy Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/22/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard C. Pepperman, II for Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp and BP Energy Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/22/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER regarding briefing on the issue of consolidation: Per plaintiffs' request in their responses to the court's December 5, 2023 show-cause order, the court extends plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the court's December 21, 2023 show-cause order to January 4, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/22/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
December 22, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Richard C. Pepperman II to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6233829.) by Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Pfaff, Alan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for attorney Michael P. Devlin to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6233826.) by Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Pfaff, Alan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for attorney Amanda Flug Davidoff to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6233806.) by Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Pfaff, Alan)
December 21, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause,,,, by Plaintiffs Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein(Fowler, Jay)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Burton Crain for Chevron Natural Gas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/21/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradley J. Benoit for Chevron Natural Gas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/21/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court is interested in hearing the parties' thoughts on whether Kansas should be included in any consolidated action involving the first four cases--and if so, whether for all purposes or for discovery only. Thus, the court extends its December 5 Order to Show Cause on consolidation to the newly filed Kansas case. The response deadlines remain largely the same parties that had entered an appearance by December 5 must file their responses by 12/22/2023; parties who had not appeared by that date must file any response within 7 days after first appearing or 21 days after being served (or agreeing to waive or accept service of) the summons and complaint, whichever is earliest. The court extends the page limit for the briefs to 4 pages. Reply briefs are not contemplated. Parties that have already filed responses to the first order to show cause may also file a response to this order to show cause directed to the issue of the extent to which the Kansas case should be consolidated with the first four cases. Any such response must be filed by 1/4/2024. Any such response briefs are limited to 2 pages. Reply briefs are not contemplated. As in the first four cases, Macquarie's deadline to file any motion to dismiss in Kansas is held in abeyance until the court issues a ruling on the matter of consolidation. At that time, the court will set a status conference to discuss motions to dismiss, including the possibility of a consolidated motion to dismiss. Macquarie may, if it wishes, file a motion to extend its answer deadline to align with the motion-to-dismiss deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/20/2023. (mam)
December 20, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Stephen Burton Crain to appear pro hac vice Motion For Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice - Stephen Burton Crain ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6231790.) by Defendant Chevron Natural Gas (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Morris, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Bradley J. Benoit to appear pro hac vice Motion For Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice - Bradley J. Benoit ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6231771.) by Defendant Chevron Natural Gas (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Morris, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein. (Fowler, Jay)
December 19, 2023 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE TO THE PARTIES. This Amended Notice corrects a typographical error in the Notice filed on 12/18/2023 (Doc. #16 ). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/19/2023. (mam)
December 18, 2023 Filing 26 STATEMENT Regarding Consolidation by Defendant Chevron Natural Gas. (Morris, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2023 Filing 25 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Morris on behalf of Chevron Natural Gas. (Morris, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 STATEMENT re #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Bengtson, David)
December 18, 2023 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP Energy Company identifying None as corporate parent. (Pfaff, Alan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp identifying None as corporate parent. (Pfaff, Alan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 21 STATEMENT re #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendants BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Pfaff, Alan)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 the parties' joint motion to extend defendants' answer deadline. The court will subsequently set the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint following a ruling on the matter of consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Macquarie Energy LLC. (McAllister, Stephen)
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen R. McAllister on behalf of Macquarie Energy LLC. (McAllister, Stephen)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Megan Carroll on behalf of Macquarie Energy LLC. (Carroll, Megan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/18/2023. (mam)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Perry for ETC Marketing, Ltd. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only ; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chantale Fiebig for ETC Marketing, Ltd. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Claire L. Chapla for ETC Marketing, Ltd. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Y. Ryan for ETC Marketing, Ltd. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION AND MOTION for Order Regarding Defendants' Response to the Complaint by BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Pfaff, Alan) Modified event type and title per chamberson 12/18/2023 (ca).
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan R. Pfaff on behalf of BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company. (Pfaff, Alan)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth Ryan to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6228016.) by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bengtson, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Claire L. Chapla to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6228009.) by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bengtson, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Chantale Fiebig to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6227999.) by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Bengtson, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Mark A. Perry to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6227989.) by Defendant ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form )(Bengtson, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Logan Fancher on behalf of ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Fancher, Logan)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David E. Bengtson on behalf of ETC Marketing, Ltd. (Bengtson, David)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs David J. Rebein, Daniel B. Giroux, Judy Krueger and Michael T. Jilka are directed to show cause within 14 days why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(2). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/6/2023. (mam)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court directs any party that wishes to be heard on the issue of consolidation to file a response to this order, briefly stating the party's position in no more than 3 pages. Parties that have entered an appearance as of today's date must file their responses by 12/22/2023. Any defendant that has not yet appeared in a case must file any response within 7 days after first appearing in the case or 21 days after being served (or agreeing to waive or accept service of) the summons and complaint, whichever is earliest. All deadlines to file motions to dismiss or to submit further briefing on any pending motion to dismiss are held in abeyance until the court issues a ruling on the matter of consolidation. At that time, the court will set a status conference to discuss motions to dismiss, including the possibility of a consolidated motion to dismiss. Meanwhile, any defendant may, if it wishes to do so, file a motion to extend its answer deadline to align it with the motion-to-dismiss deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/5/2023. (mam)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/28/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein - trial to be held in Wichita. (Fowler, Jay)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein. (Fowler, Jay)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6205795.), filed by Judy Krueger, Daniel B. Giroux, Michael T. Jilka, David J. Rebein. (Fowler, Jay)
November 17, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
November 17, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp, BP Energy Company, Chevron Natural Gas, ETC Marketing, Ltd., Macquarie Energy LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebein et al v. BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Rebein
Represented By: James P. Zakoura
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Samuel J. Walenz
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B. Giroux
Represented By: James P. Zakoura
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Samuel J. Walenz
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Krueger
Represented By: James P. Zakoura
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Samuel J. Walenz
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Jilka
Represented By: James P. Zakoura
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Samuel J. Walenz
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Canada Energy Marketing Corp
Represented By: Alan R. Pfaff
Represented By: Michael P. Devlin
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Energy Company
Represented By: Alan R. Pfaff
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff
Represented By: Michael P. Devlin
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Natural Gas
Represented By: Bradley J. Benoit
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Morris
Represented By: Stephen Burton Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETC Marketing, Ltd.
Represented By: Logan Fancher
Represented By: David E. Bengtson
Represented By: Chantale Fiebig
Represented By: Claire L. Chapla
Represented By: Mark A. Perry
Represented By: Elizabeth Y. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Energy LLC
Represented By: Stephen R. McAllister
Represented By: Megan Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?