Adams et al. v. Fruth et al.
Plaintiff: Victor Lee Adams and Jesse James Adams
Defendant: Staci LeAn Fruth and Skip O'Dell Adams
Case Number: 6:2023cv01270
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Brooks G Severson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) At the direction of Judge Eric F. Melgren, the TRO Hearing is set for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2024 at 11:00 AM in Wichita Room 403 (BGS) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 3/5/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/5/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 3/14/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on January 31, 2024. (mls)
January 30, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Skip O'Dell Adams, Staci LeAn Fruth.(Fowler, Jay)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re #14 Status Report regarding Show Cause Order filed by Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' submission regarding the Court's Show Cause Order. The Court finds that Plaintiffs have sufficiently established that the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend dismissal to the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 1/30/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
January 26, 2024 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Supplement by Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment)(McMaster, Kevin)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Status Report in response to #6 Order to Show Cause filed by Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. The status report does not sufficiently establish citizenship/domicile for defendants (but rather addresses where they are not domiciled), nor are the statements set forth in the status report as they relate to defendants supported by affidavit or other supporting documents as instructed in the Court's #6 Show Cause Order. Plaintiff shall have until and including 1/30/24 to submit a supplemental status report addressing these deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 1/16/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Skip O'Dell Adams, Staci LeAn Fruth re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Joy with Attachments, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Staci LeAn Fruth)(Fowler, Jay)
January 15, 2024 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. (McMaster, Kevin)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/31/24 for Defendants Skip O'Dell Adams and Staci LeAn Fruth to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/12/24. (ada)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jay F. Fowler on behalf of Skip O'Dell Adams, Staci LeAn Fruth. (Fowler, Jay)
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Victor Lee Adams, Jesse James Adams upon Staci LeAn Fruth served on 12/29/2023, answer due 1/19/2024 (McMaster, Kevin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Victor Lee Adams, Jesse James Adams upon Skip O'Dell Adams served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024 (McMaster, Kevin)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding diversity jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 1/2/24. (df)
December 31, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3)(McMaster, Kevin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. (McMaster, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2023: #1 Main Document) (nac).
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams. (McMaster, Kevin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Jesse James Adams, Victor Lee Adams - trial to be held in Wichita. (McMaster, Kevin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6232974.), filed by Victor Lee Adams, Jesse James Adams. (McMaster, Kevin)
December 21, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Skip O'Dell Adams, Staci LeAn Fruth. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
December 21, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al. v. Fruth et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Lee Adams
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse James Adams
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci LeAn Fruth
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skip O'Dell Adams
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?