Mai v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Troy Mai
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 6:2024cv01239
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. Initial Brief due by 3/12/2025. (Attachments: #1 001 Certification Page, #2 002 Court Transcript Index, #3 003 Administrative documents and oral hearing transcript (Pages 1 - 95), #4 004 Payment documents and decisions (Pages 96 - 174), #5 005 Jurisdictional documents and notices (Pages 175 - 236), #6 006 Non disability related development (Pages 237 - 289), #7 007 Disability related development (Pages 290 - 380), #8 008 Medical Records (Pages 381 - 2011), #9 009 Medical Records (Pages 2012 - 2404))(Verdis, Michelle)
February 5, 2025 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (to correct Plaintiff's name to Troy Mai) against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Troy Mai.(Young, Kelsey) Modified on 2/5/2025 to correct filer's name. (nac)
January 23, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On 1/21/2025, Michelle King replaced Carolyn W. Colvin as the Acting Commissioner of Social Security. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of has been updated to reflect this change. (mam)
December 23, 2024 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Verdis on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Verdis, Michelle)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Troy Mia - trial to be held in Wichita. (Young, Kelsey)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Troy Mia. (Young, Kelsey)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - SOCIAL SECURITY with trial location of Wichita. ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6546924.) Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the Notice of Electronic Filing for this Complaint has been transmitted to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas, as well as the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel, filed by Troy Mia.(Young, Kelsey)
December 20, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. Social Security Administrative Record due 2/18/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mai v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Michelle Verdis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Mai
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?