Dahms v. Kentucky Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: David Dahms
Defendant: Mike Haun, Correct Care Solutions, Inc., James Erwin, Dr. Elton Amos, Jane and John Does, Kentucky Department of Corrections, Aaron Smith, Betsy Ramey, Anna Valentine, Philip A. Campbell, Courtney Elam and Dr. Manning
Case Number: 0:2018cv00070
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Ashland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Filing 14 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SMT)
June 29, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
June 29, 2018 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00063. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Dahms w/ copy of docket sheet
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/28/2018. Plaintiff's claims in his amended complaint that are based upon the failure of officials at EKCC to timely diagnose and treat his back injury are SEVERED from this action and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Ashland Division, for all further disposition. This severance includes all claims against Defendant Elam because she is the only party Plaintiff indicates works exclusively at EKCC. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff, Defendants, General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/28/2018 denying as moot #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Dahms. (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Dahms. (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elton Amos, Correct Care Solutions, Inc., Jane and John Does, Courtney Elam, James Erwin, Kentucky Department of Corrections, Betsy Ramey, filed by David Dahms. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/17/2018. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days from the entry date of this Order. Within 30 days from the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff shall tender a summons form for each new Defendant he names. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to file an amended complaint within the time allotted will result in dismissal of the action. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form packet with the instant case number and "Amended Complaint" affixed to the caption; four summons forms; and a Pro Se Prisoner Handbook. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 2/5/2018 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: KSR to collect filing fee from inmate trust account. Clerk to open account for receipt of payment. cc: Plaintiff (pro se), Finance, KSR- Inmate Accounts (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by by David Dahms. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Dahms. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Elton Amos, Philip A. Campbell, Correct Care Solutions, Inc., Jane and John Does, Courtney Elam, James Erwin, Mike Haun, Kentucky Department of Corrections, Dr. Manning, Betsy Ramey, Aaron Smith, and Anna Valentine filed by David Dahms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/29/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahms v. Kentucky Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dahms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Elton Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?