Pioneer Credit Company v. Whelan et al
Plaintiff: Pioneer Credit Company
Defendant: Richard T. Whelan and First Financial Credit, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv00080
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Ashland Office
County: Rowan
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jaron Blandford re #17 REPLY. Error: a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judges motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JLS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to #16 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by First Financial Credit, Inc.. (Blandford, Jaron) Modified on 9/4/2018 to reflect correct link (JLS).
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss by First Financial Credit, Inc. , #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard T. Whelan filed by Pioneer Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Affidavit of Craig Bell, #2 Exhibit Case Law 1 - Dibble v. Avrich, #3 Exhibit Case Law 2 - Co. Propl & Cas. Ins. Co. v. Metal Roofing Sys., #4 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Smith, William)
August 22, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard T. Whelan (SMT)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard T. Whelan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Fox, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard T. Whelan. (Fox, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on First Financial Credit, Inc. on August 14, 2018, filed by Pioneer Credit Company. (Smith, William)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Richard T. Whelan on August 17, 2018, filed by Pioneer Credit Company. (Smith, William)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff file its response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before FRIDAY, AUGUST 24, 2018 and Defendants file their Reply no later than FRIDAY, AUGUST 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/16/18.(KSS)cc: COR
August 14, 2018 ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company, #10 MOTION to Dismiss by First Financial Credit, Inc. , #7 MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company by Pioneer Credit Company (KSS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by First Financial Credit, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - The Washington Post Article, #3 Proposed Order)(Blandford, Jaron)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Elizabeth Wood on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (Wood, Whitney)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to First Financial Credit, Inc., Richard T. Whelan; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (KSS)
August 10, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company by Pioneer Credit Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company filed by Pioneer Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Craig Bell, #2 Exhibit B-Genesis Med. Imaging v. Demars, #3 Exhibit C-Church Mut.Ins.Co.v. Smith, #4 Exhibit D-Hitachi Auto.Sys. v. TI Auto, #5 Exhibit E-Genesis Med. Img v. Demars)(KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pioneer Credit Company, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pioneer Credit Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Craig Bell, #2 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order TRO)(KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pioneer Credit Company identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mariner Finance, LLC for Pioneer Credit Company. (KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (KSS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4141484), filed by Pioneer Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Craig Bell, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Richard Whelan, #4 Summons First Financial Credit, #5 Attorney Wood Statement of Compliance)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Credit Company v. Whelan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Whelan
Represented By: John Preston Thompson
Represented By: Michael B. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Credit, Inc.
Represented By: Emily H. Cowles
Represented By: Lindsey Quijano
Represented By: Jaron P. Blanford
Represented By: Jason R. Hollon
Represented By: Jaron P. Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Credit Company
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Represented By: Whitney Elizabeth Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?