Mauldin v. USA
Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Mauldin
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 0:2018cv00083
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Ashland Office
County: Boyd
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To the extent Mauldin's recent filing #7 requests any action be taken by the Court, that request is DENIED. This matter remains closed and stricken from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/18/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Mauldin (via US Mail)
September 13, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #7 Notice to Dismiss Incorrect Filing of Tort Claim Form "Notice" Dated Aug. 14, 2018; Sent to All Prisons and USDC (KSS)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO DISMISS INCORRECT FILING OF TORT CLAIM FORM "NOTICE" DATED AUG. 14, 2018; SENT TO ALL PRISONS AND USDC by Alfred Lee Mauldin, pro se. (Clerk's note: This filing appears to be a duplicate of DE #6 received in the Lexington Clerk's Office) (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope postmarked 9-6-18)(KSS)
September 10, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Notice to Dismiss Incorrect Filing of Tort Claim Form "Notice" Dated Aug. 14, 2018; Sent to All Prisons and USDC (KSS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO DISMISS INCORRECT FILING OF TORT CLAIM FORM "NOTICE" DATED AUG. 14, 2018; SENT TO ALL PRISONS AND USDC by Alfred Lee Mauldin, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Documents in support, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/6/18)(KSS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiff's Complaint R #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/21/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Mauldin (via US Mail)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 COPY OF COMPLAINT (Standard Form 95) #1 filed by Alfred Lee Mauldin received in Lexington office (with envelope postmarked 8/14/18) (KSS)
August 16, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KSS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KSS)
August 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Standard Form 95) referred to PSO, filed by Alfred Lee Mauldin (with envelope postmarked 8/14/2018)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauldin v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?