Sublett v. Howard
Plaintiff: Damien A. Sublett
Defendant: Jason S. Howard
Case Number: 0:2018cv00084
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Ashland Office
County: Elliott
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #11 MOTION for Leave by Damien A. Sublett (JLS)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint by Damien A. Sublett, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Complaint, #2 Env no PM)(JLS)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: denying #9 Motion for Leave to supplement pursuant to Rule 15(d). Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/30/18. (SMT)cc: COR, Sublett via USMail
August 20, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #9 MOTION for Leave by Damien A. Sublett (SMT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to supplement by Damien A. Sublett, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Name not legible, #2 env no PM)(SMT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jason S. Howard. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (KSS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2018: #1 USMS Time-Stamped Summons) (KSS).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Sublett's motion for leave to proceed ifp DE #2 is GRANTED. Payment of the $50.00 admin fee and an initial partial filing fee is WAIVED. However, pursuant to 1915(b), Sublett must pay the $350.00 filing fee in the manner set forth below. 2. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Sublett's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment form (Form EDKY 525) with (a) Sublett's name (b) inmate reg number (c) this case number. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment form to the Warden of the institution in which Sublett is currently confined. 3. Each month, Sublett's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a pymt in an amt equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such mthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 4. The Deputy Clerk shall prepare a service packet for service upon dft Jason Howard. The packet to include a. completed summons form b. complaint c. this Order d. a completed USM-285. 5. The Deputy Clerk shall send the service pkt to USMS in Lex, Ky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 6. The USMS shall personally serve Dft Jason Howard at the LSCC through arrangement with the LSCC. 7. Sublett must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. If Sublett fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case. 8. If Sublett wishes to seek relief from the Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the Clerk's Office. Every motion Sublett files must include a written cert that he has mailed a copy to dft or his counsel and state date of mailing. The Court will disregard letters sent to the Judge's chambers or motions lacking a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/20/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Sublett (via US Mail), Warden (with Form EDKY 525)
August 16, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett (SMT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SMT)
August 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (SMT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Damien A. Sublett., pro se.(SMT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damien A. Sublett Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Blank AO 240)(SMT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge P SO., filed by Damien A. Sublett, pro se (No page 6 received). (Attachments: #1 Grievance Documents, #2 env no PM)(SMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sublett v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien A. Sublett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason S. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?