Dean v. Worthington et al

Defendant: Jeremy Hamrick, Cody Williams, Michael Worthington and Belinda Moore
Petitioner: Todd L. Dean
Case Number: 0:2018cv00116
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #18 Letter (JLS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Todd L. Dean dismissing case with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 1-30-19) (JLS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Todd L. Dean re #12 Order. RTS (JLS)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/16.(JLS)cc: COR Dean w/Standing Order via USMail
January 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #15 Notice of Filing (JLS)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING of "Grievance" by Todd L. Dean, pro se (Attachments: #1 Env PM 1-22-19)(JLS)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 1-22-19)(JLS)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE (Filed as "Motion for To Proceed In Forma Pauperis") by Todd L. Dean, pro se, indicating all authorization papers have been sent to correct official. (Attachments: #1 Env - PM not legible)(JLS)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. Dean's motion ifp #10 is GRANTED. 2. The financial documentation filed by Dean indicates he lacks sufficient income to pay the initial partial filing fee as required, and payment of such fee is therefore DEFERRED. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Dean's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Form EDKY 525 and serve a copy of this Order and the form to the Jailer/Warden of institution in which Dean is currently confined and upon the Office of the General Counsel for DOC in Frankfort, KY. 4. Each month Dean's custodian shall send the Clerk of Court a pymt in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund acct, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10. The custodian shall continued such monthly payments until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. Dean must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/26/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Dean, Jailer (w/form) (via US Mail)
December 19, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean (JLS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (JLS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 12-17-18)(JLS)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Dean's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/19/18. (JLS)cc: COR, Dean via US Mail
December 17, 2018 ***MOTION/FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Todd L. Dean, #8 Notice (JLS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE: Tendered by filer as a hand-written subpoena by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 12-14-18)(JLS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Todd L. Dean, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 12-14-18)(JLS)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Dean's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) The clerk of courts will mark the assigned case number on (a) an affidavit of assets/in forma pauperis application (Form AO-240) and (b) a Certificate of Inmate Account (Form 523) and send them to Dean; 3) Should Dean wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application and (3) file both of these documents with this Court; 4) Dean must take these steps within thirty (30) days or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/11/18. (JLS)cc: COR, Dean w/appropriate forms
December 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Affidavit #4 by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (JLS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Todd L. Dean, pro se, preliminary injunction and restraining order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Env PM 12/4/18)(JLS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JLS)
December 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No summons enclosed) filed by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 12/6/18)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Worthington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd L. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?