Crouch v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Sherry Crouch
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2018cv00119
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) NLT 2/15/19 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting of parties as required by Rule 26(f); (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties to EXCHANGE the disclosures required and in future MAKE supplemental disclosures when required; (3) NLT 2/25/19, counsel for parties shall FILE a written joint report of meeting advising Court on information herein. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/15/19.(KSS)cc: COR
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wyrick, Mitzi)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall have until and including January 14, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/19/18.(KSS)cc: COR
December 18, 2018 ***PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Life Insurance Company of North America (KSS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/17/18.(KSS)cc: COR
December 14, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal (KSS)
December 14, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America. (KSS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rowan Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-90285. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4241034) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouch v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Crouch
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?