Todd v. Duvall et al

Plaintiff: Jackie R. Todd, III
Defendant: Richard W. Sanders, Tim Duvall, Bobby Jack Woods, Defendants Unknown and Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 0:2018cv00126
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as a Deputy Sheriff for the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) (JLS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as a Deputy Sheriff for the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as Kentucky State Police Trooper for the Commonwealth of Kentucky), Richard W. Sanders(Individually), Richard W. Sanders(In His Official Capacity as a Kentucky State filed by Jackie R. Todd, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Police Report - Exhibit # 1)(Joy, Sebastian)
February 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #11 FIRST MOTION to Continue by Jackie R. Todd, III (JLS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION to Continue by Jackie R. Todd, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joy, Sebastian)
January 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer date of Tim Duvall, in his Official Capacity as Boyd County Deputy Sheriff and Bobby Jack Woods, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Boyd County Sheriff (JLS)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of Tim Duvall, in his Official Capacity as a Boyd County Deputy Sheriff, and Bobby Jack Woods, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Boyd County Sheriff be granted and same are granted an extension of time up through and including February 22, 2019 to file an Answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/24/19. (JLS)cc: COR
January 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as a Deputy Sheriff for the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) (JLS)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as a Deputy Sheriff for the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tim Duvall(Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Kentucky State Police Trooper for the Commonwealth of Kentucky).(Leslie, Phillip) Modified on 1/23/2019 (KSS).
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Tim Duvall(In His Official Capacity as Kentucky State Police Trooper for the Commonwealth of Kentucky), Richard W. Sanders(Individually), Richard W. Sanders(In His Official Capacity as a Kentucky State Police Commissioner for the Commonwealth of Kentucky) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Aaron Ann)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING Summons Returned Executed by Jackie R. Todd, III re #5 Certificate of Service (Joy, Sebastian) Modified on 1/15/2019 to add text (JLS).
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jackie R. Todd, III re #1 Complaint Richard Sanders (Joy, Sebastian)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie R. Todd, III via IN PERSON to Tim Duvall(Individually) served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019; Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Joy, Sebastian)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tim Duvall(Individually), Richard W. Sanders(Individually), Bobby Jack Woods(Sheriff, In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (JLS)
December 31, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4249631), filed by Jackie R. Todd, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tim Duvall, #3 Summons Richard W. Sanders, #4 Summons Bobby Jack Woods, Sheriff)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Duvall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Sanders
Represented By: Aaron Ann Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Duvall
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Leslie
Represented By: Olivia Flora Amlung
Represented By: Aaron Ann Rose Cole
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jack Woods
Represented By: Olivia Flora Amlung
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie R. Todd, III
Represented By: Sebastian M. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?